Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 02/26/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/26/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/26/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/26/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 02/26/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 02/26/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/26/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/26/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/26/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/26/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 02/27/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/28/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/04/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/05/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/07/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/12/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 03/12/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/18/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/18/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/22/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/08/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/10/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/25/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/23/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/29/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/31/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/26/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/09/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 10/15/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 10/28/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/18/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/16/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/27/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/11/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/24/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 07/31/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/12/2014