Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/05/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/13/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/19/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/12/2013