Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/14/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/28/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/28/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/18/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/18/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/23/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/06/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/13/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 05/13/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/26/2014