Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/25/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/26/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 02/27/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/05/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/05/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/06/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/07/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/13/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/14/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/08/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/03/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/08/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/09/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/16/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 11/17/2014