Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/16/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/04/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/19/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/11/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/29/2013
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 05/20/2014