Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 02/28/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/28/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/28/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/05/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/05/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/05/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/05/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/05/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 03/07/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/11/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/11/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/11/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/14/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/18/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/19/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/09/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/25/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 02/27/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/06/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/24/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/06/2014