There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Charlie Morgan Military Spouses Equal Treatment Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend titles 10, 32, 37, and 38 of the United States Code, to add a definition of spouse for purposes of military personnel policies and military and veteran benefits that recognizes new State definitions of spouse.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (3)

Date
07/24/2013Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/12/2013Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-111.
02/14/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/14/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/26/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/08/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/09/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/14/2013 Referred to
06/12/2013 Hearings by
07/24/2013 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.373. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/14/2013)

Charlie Morgan Military Spouses Equal Treatment Act of 2013 - Considers a person a spouse, for purposes of military personnel policies and military and veterans' benefits, if the marriage of the individual is valid in the state in which the marriage was entered into or, in the case of a marriage entered into outside any state, if the marriage is valid in the place in which the marriage was entered into and the marriage could have been entered into in a state. Includes as a state the District of Columbia, the Commonwealths of Puerto Rico and the Northern Mariana Islands, and U.S. territories and possessions.