Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/25/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/25/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 02/25/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/26/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/04/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/05/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/11/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/22/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 04/16/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/17/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/24/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/25/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/06/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/09/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/12/2013
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 02/25/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 03/13/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/01/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/28/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 04/28/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/29/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/30/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/01/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/01/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/06/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 05/08/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/07/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/21/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 07/28/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/09/2014