Refine your search

12 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
02/04/2014-4:45pm House Held at the desk.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/04/2014 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/04/2014-3:55pm House Received in the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/03/2014 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S704)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/03/2014 Senate The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text of committee substitute: CR S703-704)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/03/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2713 Amendment SA 2713 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/03/2014 Senate S.Amdt.2713 Amendment SA 2713 proposed by Senator Warren for Senator Pryor. (consideration: CR S704; text: CR S704)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
02/03/2014 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S703-704)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
10/28/2013 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 222.
Type of Action: Calendars
10/28/2013 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-114.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation
07/30/2013 Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation
02/25/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral