Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/26/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/12/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/12/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/13/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/16/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 05/14/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/14/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/22/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/22/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/22/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/11/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/24/2014