Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/23/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/23/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/23/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 01/23/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 01/24/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 01/24/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 01/31/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/07/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 07/18/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 05/07/2014