Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/12/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/18/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/09/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/09/2013