Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/08/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/08/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/13/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 06/27/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/24/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/17/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 02/06/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/11/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/02/2014