Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 01/23/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/08/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 01/09/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/30/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/04/2014