Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/05/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/05/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/12/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/18/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 03/19/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/21/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/11/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/25/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/25/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/10/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/13/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/19/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/27/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/10/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/11/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/11/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/17/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/17/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/23/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/24/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/29/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/29/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/09/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/11/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/11/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/12/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/16/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/23/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/09/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/09/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/28/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 10/31/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 11/12/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 12/09/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/09/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 12/10/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 12/12/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 12/16/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 12/19/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 01/07/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/04/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/26/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/12/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 03/25/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 03/27/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/14/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/18/2014