Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/18/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/20/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/20/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/21/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/21/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/23/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/03/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/03/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/03/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 06/12/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/12/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 06/24/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 07/23/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 08/01/2013