Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 03/22/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/09/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 06/24/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/08/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/31/2013