Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/28/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/08/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/08/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/22/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/14/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 06/27/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/18/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/24/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/29/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/20/2013