Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/11/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 05/06/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/15/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/20/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/03/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/11/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/05/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/15/2014