There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Israel Strategic Partnership Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to enhance the strategic partnership between the United States and Israel.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
03/05/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/06/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/11/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/11/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/11/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/12/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/12/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/12/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/18/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/18/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/08/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/09/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/10/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/15/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/15/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/16/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/17/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/23/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/25/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/06/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/07/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/21/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/21/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/23/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/23/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/04/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/04/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/04/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/07/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/07/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/10/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/25/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/26/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/26/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/08/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 07/09/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC] 07/09/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 07/18/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/23/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/24/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/25/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 09/11/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/01/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 02/24/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/04/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/31/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/07/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/08/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/29/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/06/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/08/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/22/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations03/05/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.462.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.462. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/05/2013)

United States-Israel Strategic Partnership Act of 2013 - Declares that Israel is a Major Strategic Partner of the United States.

Amends the Israel Enhanced Security Cooperation Act of 2012 to extend authority to: (1) make additions to foreign-based defense stockpiles, and (2) transfer certain obsolete or surplus Department of Defense (DOD) items to Israel.

Directs the Secretary of Commerce to take steps to make Israel eligible for the strategic trade authorization exception to the requirement for a license for the export, reexport, or in-country transfer of an item subject to certain export controls.

Authorizes the President to carry out U.S.-Israel cooperative activities and to provide assistance for cooperation in the fields of energy, water, homeland security, agriculture, and alternative fuel technologies.

Directs the President to report to Congress on the feasibility and advisability of establishing a joint United States-Israel Cyber Security Center.

Includes Israel in the visa waiver program when Israel satisfies such program's inclusion requirements and provides, subject to security concerns, reciprocal travel privileges for U.S. citizens.