Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/06/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/11/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/11/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/11/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/12/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/12/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 03/12/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/18/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/18/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 04/08/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/09/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/10/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 04/15/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/15/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/16/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/17/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/23/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 04/25/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/06/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 05/06/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/07/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/09/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/20/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/21/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 05/21/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/23/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/23/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/04/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/04/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/04/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/07/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/07/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/10/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/25/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/26/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/26/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/26/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/08/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 07/09/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/09/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 07/18/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/23/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/24/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/25/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 09/11/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/01/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 02/24/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/04/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/31/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/07/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/08/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/28/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/29/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/06/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/08/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/22/2014