Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/05/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/07/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/11/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/09/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/09/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 04/16/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/14/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/17/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/12/2013