There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

English Language Unity Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to declare English as the official language of the United States, to establish a uniform English language rule for naturalization, and to avoid misconstructions of the English language texts of the laws of the United States, pursuant to Congress' powers to provide for the general welfare of the United States and to establish a uniform rule of naturalization under article I, section 8, of the Constitution.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/05/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
03/05/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1133)
Action By: Senate
03/05/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1132-1133)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/05/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/11/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/12/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/18/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/15/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/05/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.464. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/05/2013)

English Language Unity Act of 2013- Makes English the official language of the United States.

Requires, subject to exceptions and rules of construction, that: (1) official functions of the U.S. government be conducted in English, and (2) all naturalization ceremonies be conducted in English.

Establishes a uniform English language rule for naturalization.

Makes English language requirements and workplace policies, whether in the public or private sector, presumptively consistent with the laws of the United States.

Directs the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to issue for public notice and comment a proposed rule for uniform testing of English language ability of candidates for naturalization based upon the principles that: (1) all citizens should be able to read and understand generally the English language text of the Declaration of Independence, the Constitution, and the laws of the United States; and (2) any exceptions to this standard should be limited to extraordinary circumstances, such as asylum.