Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/18/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 10/02/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/19/2013