Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/13/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/13/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 03/13/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/13/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/21/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/21/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/16/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/16/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/18/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/21/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/21/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/21/2013