Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/06/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/07/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/20/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/08/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 04/08/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/10/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 04/01/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 04/08/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/22/2014