Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/23/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/23/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/29/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/31/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/01/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/01/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/03/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/30/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/11/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/29/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/03/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/12/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/27/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/11/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 04/10/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/07/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 07/07/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/08/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/15/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/15/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/17/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/30/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/18/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/18/2014