Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/23/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/03/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 10/30/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/11/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 01/29/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/03/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 02/12/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 03/11/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/07/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/30/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/18/2014