Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/23/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/29/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/31/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/01/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 08/01/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 02/27/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 04/10/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/07/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/08/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 07/15/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/15/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/17/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/18/2014