Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/20/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 03/21/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/22/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 05/06/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/31/2013