Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/07/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/11/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/18/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/11/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 06/04/2013