Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 03/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/08/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/21/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/21/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/03/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/10/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/16/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/10/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/05/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/08/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/02/2014