Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/07/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/14/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/03/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/24/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/12/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/02/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/04/2014