Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/29/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/30/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/17/2013