Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
08/01/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-144.
08/01/2014 Signed by President.
07/28/2014 Presented to President.
07/25/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.(text: CR H6835-6836)
07/17/2014 By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-212.
07/15/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4510-4511; text as passed Senate: CR S4510-4511)
07/10/2014 Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/11/2013 Introduced in Senate