There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to promote consumer choice and wireless competition by permitting consumers to unlock mobile wireless devices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
08/01/2014Became Public Law No: 113-144. (TXT | PDF)
08/01/2014Signed by President.
07/28/2014Presented to President.
07/25/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.(text: CR H6835-6836)
07/17/2014By Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-212.
07/15/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4510-4511; text as passed Senate: CR S4510-4511)
07/10/2014Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/11/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
08/01/2014Became Public Law No: 113-144. (TXT | PDF)
08/01/2014Signed by President.
07/28/2014SenatePresented to President.
07/25/2014-1:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2014-1:01pmHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote. (text: CR H6835-6836)
07/25/2014-1:01pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6835-6836)
07/25/2014-1:01pmHouseMr. Chaffetz asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
07/17/2014SenateBy Senator Leahy from Committee on the Judiciary filed written report. Report No. 113-212.
07/16/2014-4:58pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/16/2014-10:25amHouseReceived in the House.
07/16/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/15/2014SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4510-4511; text as passed Senate: CR S4510-4511)
07/10/2014SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 461.
07/10/2014SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/10/2014SenateCommittee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
03/11/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1595)
03/11/2013SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1594-1595)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary03/11/2013 Referred to
07/10/2014 Markup by
07/10/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-212

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.517. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-144 (08/01/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on July 10, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act - Repeals a Library of Congress (LOC) rulemaking determination, made upon the recommendation of the Register of Copyrights, regarding the circumvention of technological measures controlling access to copyrighted software on wireless telephone handsets (mobile telephones) for the purpose of connecting to different wireless telecommunications networks (a practice commonly referred to as "unlocking" such devices). Reestablishes, as an exemption to provisions of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act (DMCA) prohibiting such circumvention, a previous LOC rule permitting the use of computer programs, in the form of firmware or software, that enable used wireless telephone handsets to connect to a wireless telecommunications network, when circumvention is initiated by the owner of the copy of such computer program solely to connect to such a network and access to the network is authorized by the network operator, thus permitting unlocked phones.

Directs the Librarian of Congress, upon the recommendation of the Register, to determine whether to extend such exemption to include any other category of wireless devices in addition to wireless telephone handsets (e.g., tablets and other mobile broadband-enabled devices).

Allows such circumvention (unlocking) to be initiated by the owner of such a device, by another person at the direction of the owner, or by a provider of a commercial mobile radio service or a commercial mobile data service at the direction of such owner or other person, solely in order to enable such owner or a family member of such owner to connect to a wireless telecommunications network, when such connection is authorized by the operator of such network.

Prohibits this Act from being construed to alter any party's rights under existing law.