Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 03/12/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/21/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/11/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/26/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/09/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/11/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/24/2013