Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/22/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 02/07/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/11/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 03/12/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/12/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/13/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 03/13/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/11/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/11/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/09/2013