There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Temporary Debt Limit Extension Act

Other Short Titles

Temporary Debt Limit Extension Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Temporary Debt Limit Extension Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to temporarily extend the public debt limit, and for other purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the air route traffic control center located in Nashua, New Hampshire, as the "Patricia Clark Boston Air Route Traffic Control Center".


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
02/15/2014Became Public Law No: 113-83. (TXT | PDF)
02/15/2014Signed by President.
02/14/2014Presented to President.
02/12/2014Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment to Senate bill by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 43. Record Vote Number: 34.(text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S933)
02/11/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 201 (Roll No. 61).(text: CR H1752)
03/21/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2232)
03/21/2013Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2231-2232)
03/12/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/15/2014Became Public Law No: 113-83. (TXT | PDF)
02/15/2014Signed by President.
02/14/2014SenatePresented to President.
02/12/2014-5:30pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 82, enrollment corrections on S. 540 have been made.
02/12/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/12/2014SenateSenate agreed to House amendment to Senate bill by Yea-Nay Vote. 55 - 43. Record Vote Number: 34. (text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S933)
02/12/2014SenateCloture on the motion to concur in House amendment to Senate bill invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 67 - 31. Record Vote Number: 33. (consideration: CR S934)
02/12/2014SenateCloture motion on the motion to concur in House amendment to Senate bill presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S933-934: text: CR S933-934)
02/12/2014SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
02/11/2014-5:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/11/2014-5:28pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 221 - 201 (Roll No. 61). (text: CR H1752)
02/11/2014-4:57pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1757)
02/11/2014-4:17pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 478 the amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of sections 1 through 3 of Rules Committee Print 113-37 is considered as adopted for the purpose of being treated as original text and the House proceeded with one hour of debate on S. 540.
02/11/2014-4:15pmHouseRule provides for consideration of S. 540 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
02/11/2014-4:15pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 478. (consideration: CR H1752-1758)
02/11/2014-4:14pmHouseRule H. Res. 478 passed House.
02/11/2014-3:52pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 478 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of S. 540 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
03/26/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/25/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/25/2013-10:02amHouseReceived in the House.
03/22/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/21/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2232)
03/21/2013SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2231-2232)
03/12/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 03/12/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation03/12/2013 Referred to
03/21/2013 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/25/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation03/26/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.540. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-83 (02/15/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on February 11, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Temporary Debt Limit Extension Act - Suspends the public debt limit for the period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act and ending on March 15, 2015.

Increases the debt limit, effective March 16, 2015, to the extent that:

  1. the face amount of such obligations outstanding on the date of enactment of this Act is exceeded by
  2. the total of the face amount of public debt obligations and the face amount of obligations whose principal and interest are guaranteed by the U.S. government (except guaranteed obligations held by the Secretary of the Treasury) outstanding on March 16, 2015.

Excludes an obligation under clause 2 (above) from being taken into account unless its issuance was necessary to fund a commitment incurred pursuant to law that required payment before March 16, 2015.

Prohibits the Secretary of the Treasury from issuing obligations during the period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act and ending on March 15, 2015, for the purpose of increasing the cash balance above normal operating balances in anticipation of the expiration of such period.