There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Hydropower Regulatory Efficiency Act of 2013

Short Titles as Introduced

Hydropower Improvement Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve hydropower, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/03/2013By Senator Wyden from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 113-36.
05/13/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/13/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
06/03/2013By Senator Wyden from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 113-36.
Action By: Senate
05/13/2013Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 69.
Action By: Senate
05/13/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/08/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/23/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-24.
03/13/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate
03/13/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1787)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/13/2013 Referred to
04/23/2013 Hearings by
05/08/2013 Markup by
05/13/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-36

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.545. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (05/13/2013)

Hydropower Regulatory Efficiency Act of 2013 - (Sec. 3) Amends the Public Utility Regulatory Policies Act of 1978 (PURPA) to increase from 5,000 to 10,000 kilowatts the size of small hydroelectric power projects which the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC) may exempt from its license requirements.

(Sec. 4) Amends the Federal Power Act to revise the limitation on the maximum installation capacity of qualifying conduit hydropower facilities that are eligible for an exemption from licensing requirements.

Requires any person, state, or municipality proposing to construct a qualifying conduit hydropower facility to file with FERC a notice of intent to do so. Requires FERC, within 15 days after receiving such a notice of intent, to make an initial determination as to whether the facility meets the qualifying criteria.

Waives license requirements for any conduit hydroelectric facility that: (1) uses for electric power generation only the hydroelectric potential of a non-federally owned conduit, (2) has a maximum installed capacity of 5 megawatts, and (3) is not currently licensed or exempted from license requirements.

Redefines "conduit" to specify any tunnel, canal, pipeline, aqueduct, flume, ditch, or similar manmade water conveyance operated for the distribution of water for agricultural, municipal, or industrial consumption and not primarily for the generation of electricity.

Authorizes FERC to: (1) exempt from license requirements any electric power generation facility that utilizes for such generation only the hydroelectric potential of a conduit, and has an installed capacity or 40 megawatts or fewer; and (2) extend the preliminary permit period for up to 2 additional years beyond the 3 years otherwise allowed if it finds that the permittee has implemented activities under the permit in good faith and with reasonable diligence.

(Sec. 6) Directs FERC to: (1) investigate the feasibility of issuing a license for hydropower development at nonpowered dams and closed loop pumped storage projects during a two-year period, and (2) hold workshops and develop hydropower pilot projects.

(Sec. 7) Directs the Secretary of Energy (DOE) to study: (1) the technical flexibility that existing pumped storage facilities can provide to support intermittent renewable electric energy generation, including the potential for such facilities to be upgraded or retrofitted with advanced commercially available technology; and (2) the technical potential of existing pumped storage facilities and new advanced pumped storage facilities to provide grid reliability benefits.