Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 03/14/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 04/15/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/23/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/16/2013