Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/09/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/08/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/10/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/24/2013