Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/23/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/28/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/22/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/09/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/22/2014