Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/13/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/19/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 03/19/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/19/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/21/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/21/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 04/09/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/18/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/18/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/25/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/25/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/08/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/08/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/09/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 04/07/2014