Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 03/13/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/08/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/16/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/11/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/13/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 06/27/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/23/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/23/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 12/16/2013