Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/09/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/20/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/22/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/22/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 06/18/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/18/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/31/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/06/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/24/2014