Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 04/11/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/20/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/10/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/08/2014