Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/21/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/10/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/25/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 05/07/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/21/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 06/13/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/18/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/11/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/10/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/04/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/10/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/17/2014