Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/19/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/19/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/19/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/19/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/19/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/19/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 03/19/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 03/21/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/23/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 09/18/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 10/30/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/10/2014