Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 03/14/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/10/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 11/14/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 11/19/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/12/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 12/18/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/04/2014